Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aurelio García Macías

Under Secretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Titular Bishop of Rotdon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1965 Born
20 Sep 199227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
27 May 202156.1AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
27 May 202156.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
11 Jul 202156.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon

MicroData Summary for Aurelio García Macías
Father Aurelio García Macías (born ) Under Secretary of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

EventPlace
Birth PlacePollos, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained PriestCathedral, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2021
  • op/ob/c2: CB, 27 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 May 2021

Quantcast