Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro de Galganis

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1328AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
29 Jan 1354AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
3 Nov 1362DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Galganis
Archbishop Pietro de Galganis (died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 418, and Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast