Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Abel Doctor Gabuza

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Durban, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1955Born
15 Dec 198429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pretoria, South Africa
23 Dec 201055.7AppointedBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
19 Mar 201155.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
9 Dec 201863.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Durban, South Africa
17 Jan 202165.8DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Durban, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Abel Doctor Gabuza
Archbishop Abel Doctor Gabuza (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Durban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlexandra
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Collège Saint Patrick, Kimberley, Diocese of Kimberley
Death PlaceHillcrest, Hospital, Hillcrest

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,966
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2018
  • d: CB, 17 Jan 2021
  • mn: CB, 23 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Apr 2021

Quantcast