Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Foyos (Foios), O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Bodona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1640³Born
1 Nov 166423.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
2 Nov 166423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Sep 169554.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal
19 Sep 169554.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bodona
13 Feb 170867.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Foyos (Foios)
Bishop Pedro de Foyos (Foios) O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa

  • a priest for 43.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
  • bd/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast