Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Galo Fernández Villaseca

Bishop of Talca, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1961 Born
14 Aug 198625.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
12 Dec 198726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
1 Feb 201452.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
1 Feb 201452.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Simingi
10 May 201453.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simingi
28 Jun 201857.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Talca, Chile
20 Mar 202160.1AppointedBishop of Talca, Chile
27 May 202160.3InstalledBishop of Talca, Chile

MicroData Summary for Galo Fernández Villaseca
Bishop Galo Fernández Villaseca (born ) Bishop of Talca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Talca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 1 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 10 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,152
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2021
  • c01: AM, 20 Mar 2021
  • i: AM, 16 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast