Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Trinidad Fernández Angulo

Bishop of Trujillo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1964 Born
30 Jul 198925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mérida, Venezuela
17 Apr 201449.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
17 Apr 201449.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pumentum
6 Jul 201450.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pumentum
15 Jul 202157.1AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
8 Oct 202157.3InstalledBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Trinidad Fernández Angulo
Bishop José Trinidad Fernández Angulo (born ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Archdiocese of Mérida
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trujillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,216
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2021
  • opd/c1: CB, 15 Jul 2021
  • i: CB, 28 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Sep 2021

Quantcast