Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edinson Edgardo Farfán Córdova, O.S.A.

Prelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1974 Born
1998²23.2EnteredMember of Order of St. Augustine
11 Jan 200328.3ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
26 Jul 200833.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
24 Apr 201843.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chuquibambilla, Peru
7 Dec 201945.2AppointedPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru
4 Jan 202045.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edinson Edgardo Farfán Córdova
Bishop Edinson Edgardo Farfán Córdova O.S.A. (born ) Prelate of Chuquibambilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTambo Grande, Archdiocese of Piura
Ordained BishopSanta Rita de Casia, Church, San Jerónimo, Archdiocese of Cuzco

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Chuquibambilla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast