Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Fabene

Secretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Titular Archbishop of Mons Faliscus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1959 Born
26 May 198425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montefiascone, Italy
8 Feb 201454.9AppointedUnder Secretary of the Synod of Bishops
8 Apr 201455.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
30 May 201455.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
28 Feb 201757.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons Faliscus
18 Jan 202161.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
18 Jan 202161.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mons Faliscus

MicroData Summary for Fabio Fabene (VIAF: 54469200)
Archbishop Fabio Fabene (born ) Secretary of Causes of Saints

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 26 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,173
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2017, Number 1
  • ab: CB, 4 Apr 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast