Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Harry Entwistle

Ordinary Emeritus of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1940 Born
15 Jun 201272.0AppointedOrdinary of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia
15 Jun 201272.0Ordained PriestPriest of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia
26 Mar 201978.8RetiredOrdinary of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia

MicroData Summary for Harry Entwistle
Monsignor Harry Entwistle (born ) Ordinary Emeritus of Our Lady of the Southern Cross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChorley, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestPerth, Western Australia, Archdiocese of Perth

Please contact the Monsignor through the Personal Ordinariate of Our Lady of the Southern Cross.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2012
  • c1: CB, 15 Jun 2012
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Feb 2021

Quantcast