Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bohdan Dzyurakh, C.SS.R.

Apostolic Exarch of Germany and Scandinavia {Deutschland und Skandinavien} (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Vagada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1967 Born
17 Mar 199123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Aug 199124.4EnteredPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Aug 199528.4Perpetual VowsPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Dec 200538.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Dec 200538.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagada
15 Feb 200638.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagada
29 Jul 200942.3AppointedCurial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
18 Feb 202153.9AppointedApostolic Exarch of Germany and Scandinavia {Deutschland und Skandinavien} (Ukrainian)
18 Apr 202154.0InstalledApostolic Exarch of Germany and Scandinavia {Deutschland und Skandinavien} (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Bohdan Dzyurakh
Bishop Bohdan Dzyurakh C.SS.R. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Germany and Scandinavia {Deutschland und Skandinavien}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHirske, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Ordained BishopSaint Georges, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Germany and Scandinavia {Deutschland und Skandinavien} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,064
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • opd/ente: CB, 29 Jan 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2021
  • i: CB, 31 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Apr 2021

Quantcast