Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
7 Nov 1965 | Born | ||
30 Jun 1999 | 33.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam |
30 Oct 2021 | 55.9 | Appointed | Coadjutor Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam |
14 Dec 2021 | 56.1 | Ordained Bishop | Coadjutor Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam |
17 Jun 2023 | 57.6 | Succeeded | Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam |
(WikiData: Q109323898)
Bishop
Joseph
Đỗ Quang Khang
(born )
Bishop
of Bắc Ninh
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Thu Duc, Archdiocese of Saigon |
Ordained Bishop | In Front of, Cathedral, Bắc Ninh, Diocese of Bắc Ninh |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠