Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Bruno (George) Doerfler, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1866Born
1893²26.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Aug 189730.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Aug 191144.6AppointedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
18 Oct 191144.8InstalledAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
12 Jun 191952.4DiedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bruno (George) Doerfler
Abbot Bruno (George) Doerfler O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint Peter-Muenster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichfield, MN, USA
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceElisabethinen, Hospital, Humboldt, Saskatchewan
Buried Place (Original)Abbey, Cemetery, Territorial Abbey of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan

  • a priest for 21.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast