Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto de Laurentiis

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1879Born
19 Sep 190323.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 192849.1AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
20 Jan 192949.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
4 Jan 195676.2DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto de Laurentiis
Bishop Ernesto de Laurentiis (born , died ) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast