Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio D’Angelo

Auxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Titular Bishop of Pumentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1971 Born
14 Sep 199625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Termoli-Larino, Italy
14 Aug 202150.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy
14 Aug 202150.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pumentum
12 Sep 202150.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pumentum

MicroData Summary for Antonio D’Angelo
Bishop Antonio D’Angelo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelmauro (Campobasso), Diocese of Termoli
Ordained PriestCastelmauro, Diocese of Termoli-Larino
Ordained BishopSanta Maria di Collemaggio, Basilica, L’Aquila, Archdiocese of L’Aquila

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of L’Aquila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Aug 2021
  • c1: AM, 24 Aug 2021
  • c34: CB, 6 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Sep 2021

Quantcast