Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rodrigo da Cunha

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1577³Born
6 Jul 161537.6ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
8 Nov 161538.0Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
12 Nov 161841.0AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
8 Aug 162648.7SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Jan 162749.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Dec 163558.0AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal
3 Jan 164365.1DiedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo da Cunha
Archbishop Rodrigo da Cunha (born Nov 1577, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 120, and Page 286
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 285, and Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 25
  • bd: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast