Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottavio Accoramboni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549¹Born
15 May 157930.3AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
8 Jun 157930.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
1610¹61.0ResignedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
4 Jun 161465.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
4 Jun 162071.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
17 May 162172.3AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
1623²74.0ResignedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
23 Jun 163485.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Accoramboni (VIAF: 90313173)
Archbishop Ottavio Accoramboni (born 1549, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Gregorio al Celio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 55.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 353
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 249
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1579, Number 16*
  • b: Treccani.it, 13 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2: AT, 6 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Jun 2021

Quantcast