Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Antonio Cornejo Monzón

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Decoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1964 Born
8 Dec 199430.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
14 Dec 199632.1IncardinatedPriest of Lurín, Peru
10 Feb 202156.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
10 Feb 202156.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Decoriana
28 May 202156.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Decoriana

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Antonio Cornejo Monzón
Bishop Guillermo Antonio Cornejo Monzón (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiura, Diocese of Piura
Ordained PriestCathedral Basilica, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Apr 2021
  • ~c2: CB, 1 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 14 May 2021
  • c34: CB, 28 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast