Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Caputo de’ Marchesi di Cerreto

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1774Born
20 Sep 180026.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 181844.6SelectedBishop of Lecce, Italy
21 Dec 181844.8ConfirmedBishop of Lecce, Italy
3 Jan 181944.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lecce, Italy
6 Nov 186288.7DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Caputo de’ Marchesi di Cerreto
Bishop Nicola Caputo de’ Marchesi di Cerreto (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceLecce, Diocese of Lecce
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lecce, Diocese of Lecce

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 238
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast