Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Čársky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Košice, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Thagora

Apostolic Administrator of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1886Born
26 Jul 190923.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 192538.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rožňava, Slovakia
30 Mar 192538.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
14 Jun 192539.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora
12 Nov 192539.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Košice, Slovakia
11 Nov 193852.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Košice, Slovakia
23 Feb 194659.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Košice, Slovakia
11 Mar 196275.8DiedApostolic Administrator of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Jozef Čársky
Bishop Jozef Čársky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Košice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGbely, Hungary

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast