Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Carruthers

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Ceramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1770Born
25 Mar 179525.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 183262.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Sep 183262.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
13 Jan 183362.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
24 May 185282.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Carruthers
Bishop Andrew Carruthers (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrumillan Miln, New Abbey, Kirkcudbrightshire
Ordained PriestAberdeen
Ordained BishopEdinburgh
Death PlaceDundee
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Cathedral, Edinburgh

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 1
  • b: The Catholic Hierarchy of Scotland, Page 18, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Mar 2021

Quantcast