Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Paul IV

Gian Pietro Carafa

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1476Born
30 Jul 150529.0AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
18 Sep 150630.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chieti, Italy
20 Dec 151842.4AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
20 Dec 151842.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chieti, Italy
8 Aug 152448.1ResignedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
24 Aug 152448.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Chieti, Italy
22 Dec 153660.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153760.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
20 Jun 153760.9AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
24 Sep 153761.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
6 Jul 154165.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
24 Sep 154367.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
17 Oct 154468.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
8 Oct 154670.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
22 Feb 154972.6AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
28 Feb 155073.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
29 Nov 155377.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
11 Dec 155377.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
23 May 155578.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 May 155578.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Aug 155983.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Gian Pietro Carafa (VIAF: 88875623)
Pope Gian Pietro Carafa (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapriglia
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Family Chapel (S. Tommaso d'Aquino), S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 52.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 255, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast