Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Antonio Calderón Lázaro

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1711Born
20 Aug 176452.7AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
28 Oct 176452.9Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
15 Oct 178674.9DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Antonio Calderón Lázaro
Bishop Bernardo Antonio Calderón Lázaro (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudia

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,700, Page 81, Number 409
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast