Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexandre de Bucy

Bishop-Elect of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1970 Born
1996¹25.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Versailles, France
29 Jun 199726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
22 May 202453.7AppointedBishop of Agen, France
1 Sep 202454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Bucy
(WikiData: Q126030674)
Father Alexandre de Bucy (born ) Bishop-Elect of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, Diocese of Nanterre
Ordained BishopSaint Caprais, Cathedral, Agen, Diocese of Agen

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Agen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2024
  • ob/c012: CB, 22 May 2024
  • c3+: CB, 14 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Jul 2024