Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Brossart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky, USA

Titular Bishop of Vallis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1849Born
1 Sep 189242.8Ordained PriestPriest of Covington, Kentucky, USA
9 Dec 191566.1AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
25 Jan 191666.2Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
2 Mar 192373.3ResignedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
2 Mar 192373.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
6 Aug 193080.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Brossart
Bishop Ferdinand Brossart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuechelberg, Germany

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast