Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Horacio Alberto Bózzoli

Deceased

Archbishop of Tucumán, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1927Born
18 Sep 195427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Mar 197345.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Martín, Argentina
30 Mar 197345.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
13 May 197345.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
5 Apr 197547.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
11 Jul 197851.0AppointedBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
30 Sep 197851.2InstalledBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
19 Jan 198355.5AppointedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
30 Dec 199366.5DiedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Horacio Alberto Bózzoli (VIAF: 88630634)
Archbishop Horacio Alberto Bózzoli (born , died ) Archbishop of Tucumán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopNuestra Seńora de Lourdes, Church, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,116
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 May 2021

Quantcast