Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal du Bosquet

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Sep 1365AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
22 Sep 1368AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
22 Sep 1368Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 1371DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

MicroData Summary for Bernard du Bosquet
Bernard Cardinal du Bosquet (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCahors, Diocese of Cahors, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jul 2021

Quantcast