Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raúl Biord Castillo, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1962 Born
16 Aug 198017.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Sep 198724.8Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jun 198825.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Jul 198926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Nov 201351.1AppointedBishop of La Guaira, Venezuela
8 Feb 201451.2Ordained BishopBishop of La Guaira, Venezuela
28 Jun 202461.6AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Raúl Biord Castillo
(VIAF: 233583523; WikiData: Q15263639)
Archbishop Raúl Biord Castillo S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained DeaconRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopPolideportivo José María Vargas, La Guaira, Diocese of La Guaira

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2013
  • c1: CB, 1 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,095
  • od: CB, 28 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 29 Jun 2024