Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop EstÍv„o Binga

Auxiliary Bishop of Benguela, Angola

Titular Bishop of Nasbinca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1966 Born
28 Apr 199629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Benguela, Angola
3 Nov 202155.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Benguela, Angola
3 Nov 202155.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
6 Feb 202255.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasbinca

MicroData Summary for EstÍv„o Binga
(WikiData: Q109375694)
Bishop EstÍv„o Binga (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Benguela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTwei, Archdiocese of Lubango
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Nossa Senhora dos Navegantes, Chapel, Benguela, Diocese of Benguela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Benguela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2021
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2021
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 251, Number 20,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024