Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adelar Baruffi

Archbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1969 Born
12 Jan 199525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Dec 201445.1AppointedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Mar 201545.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Mar 201545.4InstalledBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Sep 202151.9AppointedArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
31 Oct 202152.0InstalledArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adelar Baruffi
Archbishop Adelar Baruffi (born ) Archbishop of Cascavel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoronel Pilar
Ordained BishopSanctuaire Santo Antônio, Bento Gonçalves, Diocese of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cascavel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2014
  • ob/bp: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • i: CB, 30 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,382
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2021
  • i: CB, 28 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Sep 2021

Quantcast