Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Maria Attilio Barneschi, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Manzini, eSwatini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1892Born
18 Sep 191927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 Mar 193946.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Swaziland
15 Mar 193946.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
30 Apr 193946.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
11 Jan 195158.5AppointedBishop of Bremersdorp, eSwatini
21 May 196572.9DiedBishop of Manzini, eSwatini

MicroData Summary for Costantino Maria Attilio Barneschi
(WikiData: Q60835318)
Bishop Costantino Maria Attilio Barneschi O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Manzini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoiano della Chiana, Italy

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1939, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024