Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ettore Baranzini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1881Born
27 Mar 190422.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 193351.6AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
5 Jun 193351.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 May 195068.6AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa e Ragusa, Italy
1 Oct 195574.0AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 Mar 196886.4DiedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ettore Baranzini
Archbishop Ettore Baranzini (born , died ) Archbishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngera

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast