Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
21 May 1964 | Born | ||
5 Jul 1995 | 31.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Barquisimeto, Venezuela |
12 Apr 2023 | 58.8 | Appointed | Bishop of Guanare, Venezuela |
1 Jul 2023 | 59.1 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Guanare, Venezuela |
8 Dec 2023 | 59.5 | Appointed | Apostolic Administrator of Barquisimeto, Venezuela |
(WikiData: Q117601063)
Bishop
Owaldo Enrique
Araque Valero (Valerio)
(born )
Bishop
of Guanare
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Chiguará, Archdiocese of Mérida |
Ordained Bishop | Nuestra Señora de Coromoto, Shrine, Guanare, Diocese of Guanare |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠