Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund von Sachsen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1416BornGrimma
2 Jan 144023.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
20 Jan 144023.9SucceededBishop of Würzburg, Germany
Oct 1440³24.6Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
14 Aug 144226.4ResignedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
24 Dec 147155.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigmund von Sachsen:
Bishop Sigmund von Sachsen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013