Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton von Rotenhan

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1391Born
Sep 143140.6SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 Nov 143140.8ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
24 Aug 143241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
5 May 145968.3DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton von Rotenhan
Bishop Anton von Rotenhan (born 1391, died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRentweinsdorf

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,716

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018