Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Visconti

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617²Born
23 Jun 168164.4AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 Aug 168164.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1 Sep 168164.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168164.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
7 Jan 169376.0DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Visconti (VIAF: 69800627)
Federico Cardinal Visconti (born 1617, died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • c3+: CB, 1 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 23
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016