Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Antonio Vib˛

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1630BornTorino
20 Dec 165424.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 165424.2Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 1667³36.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to France
Mar 1668³37.4ResignedApostolic Internuncio to France
Jul 1671³40.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to France
Jun 1672³41.6ResignedApostolic Internuncio to France
27 Nov 169060.1AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
16 Dec 169060.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
13 Feb 171382.3DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Antonio Vib˛
Archbishop Michele Antonio Vib˛ (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 370
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1690, Number 49
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Oct 2016
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016