Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Viale

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹Born
10 Sep 160850.6AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
14 Sep 160850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
7 Dec 162466.9DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Viale
Bishop Ottavio Viale (born 1558, died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 29
  • c2+: AT, 16 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,975

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018