Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vaira

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1649BornVenetiarum
4 Jun 167526.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 171263.1AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
3 Apr 171263.2Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
12 Jul 171768.5AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
8 Oct 173283.7DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vaira:
Bishop Antonio Vaira (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 69, and Page 307
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 May 2013
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013