Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Torelli

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1624Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 1624AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
13 Oct 1624Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
1629²ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
3 Apr 1630DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Torelli
Archbishop Paolo Torelli (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma

  • a priest for 5.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 86, Number 513
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast