Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Tobji

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1971 BornAleppo
16 Mar 199624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
14 Mar 201543.9SelectedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
31 Oct 201544.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
7 Dec 201544.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Tobji:
Archbishop Joseph Tobji (born ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 7 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015