Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Thuanus

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹BornGrosotto
162324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
3 Oct 163940.7AppointedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
11 Dec 163940.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
11 Jan 166667.0DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Thuanus:
Bishop Johannes Thuanus (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,007
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256, and Page 378
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015