Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Wadih Tayah

Deceased

Bishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1927Born
7 Dec 195427.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 199568.3AppointedBishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)
3 Feb 199668.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)
4 May 200274.8DiedBishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)

MicroData Summary for Pierre Wadih Tayah
Bishop Pierre Wadih Tayah (born , died ) Bishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGhazir

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,680
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast