Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Tarugi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638²BornFerrara
12 Dec 169557.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169658.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ferrara, Italy
2 Jan 169658.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala
12 Feb 169658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
27 Dec 169658.9DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Tarugi:
Domenico Cardinal Tarugi (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Ferrara

  • a bishop for .8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • c34: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015