Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Spinelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1746Born
18 Jun 176923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jul 177933.0AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
18 Jul 177933.1Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
16 Dec 179145.5SelectedBishop of Lecce, Italy
26 Mar 179245.7ConfirmedBishop of Lecce, Italy
24 Oct 179751.3SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
18 Dec 179751.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
8 Jan 180558.5DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Spinelli
Archbishop Salvatore Spinelli O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155, and Page 261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018