Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Sobrino Morillas

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²BornSalamanca
5 Sep 161671.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
4 Dec 161671.9Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
8 Jan 161873.0DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sobrino Morillas:
Bishop Francisco Sobrino Morillas (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,498
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 133, Number 850
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015