Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Daniel von Sommerfeld

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1681BornBirkholz
22 Mar 170423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
13 Jun 171433.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
13 Jun 171433.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
19 Aug 171433.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
16 May 174261.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
26 Jul 174261.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Elias Daniel von Sommerfeld:
Bishop Elias Daniel von Sommerfeld (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013