Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Sagrada (Segrada), P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Toungoo

Titular Bishop of Hirina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1860BornBorghetto Lodigiano, Italy
18 May 190847.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}, Myanmar
18 May 190847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
24 Jan 190948.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
1936²75.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Toungoo, Myanmar
10 Feb 193978.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Toungoo, Myanmar

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Sagrada (Segrada):
Bishop Emmanuel Sagrada (Segrada) P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Toungoo

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013