Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Salzilla

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1643AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
19 Apr 1643Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
12 May 1646AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
Nov 1646²DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Salzilla
Bishop Alessandro Salzilla (died Nov 1646) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84, and Page 346
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643
  • ob/c2+: AT, 20 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Sep 2016