Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Sarnelli

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1649BornPolignanen
12 Mar 167223.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 169243.2AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
4 May 169243.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
7 Jul 172475.5DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Sarnelli:
Bishop Pompeo Sarnelli (died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 415
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013