Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastião de São Pedro, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549¹BornCondexa, France
9 Jan 160657.0AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
16 Feb 161566.1AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
7 Oct 162475.7AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
7 Nov 162980.8DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastião de São Pedro:
Archbishop Sebastião de São Pedro O.S.A. (born 1549, died ) Archbishop of Goa

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 54
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155, and Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015